Jeffries v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Amy Dawn Jeffries
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00162
Filed: October 16, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Braxton
Referring Judge: John S. Kaull
Presiding Judge: Irene M. Keeley
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER/OPINION The Court finds Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause, based on excusable neglect, for her failure to timely file her Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 11 is therefore ordered filed. Defendant shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order to file his Motion for Summary Judgment in response. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 2/18/2013. (kd)
March 26, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; DENIES as to 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. GRANTS as to 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. ADOPTS as to 15 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSES this civil action WITH PREJUDICE and ORDERS that it stricken from the docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/26/2014. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)
January 31, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER/OPINION; Court ORDERED on or before February 13, 2013, Plaintiff shall, in writing, show good cause, if any she can, why she failed to timely file her Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support in accord with the Local Rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 1/31/2013. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jeffries v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Dawn Jeffries
Represented By: Montie VanNostrand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]