Loy v. Seifert

Petitioner: Ray Loy
Respondent: Evelyn Seifert
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00117
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Hancock
Referring Judge: John S. Kaull
Presiding Judge: Irene M. Keeley
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 29 and denying 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by Evelyn Seifert. The Court ORDERS Seifert to file ananswer to the petition within twenty-eight (28) days from the dateof the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/30/2013. (Copy pro se petitioner/cmrrr)(kd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2013: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kd).
January 17, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON PETITIONERS MOTIONFOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Dkt. No. 48 . Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/17/2014. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF, pro se plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
August 1, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DKT. NO. 69 , GRANTING THE RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DKT. NO. 52 , AND DENYINGTHE PETITIONERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DKT. NO. 65 . Court ORDERS that Loys 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and stricken from the Courts docket. Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter a separate judgment order. Signed by District Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/1/2014. (Copy counsel of record via CM/ECF, pro se petitioner via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Loy v. Seifert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ray Loy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Evelyn Seifert
Represented By: Robert D Goldberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]