Friend v. Remac America, Inc.

Defendant: Remac America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Friend
Case Number: 3:2012cv00017
Filed: March 1, 2012
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Mineral
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 38 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE/CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING 35 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/14/13. (njz)
February 14, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 42 MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/14/13. (njz)
March 12, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION 66 TO EXTEND DEADLINES. The Court will issue a Second Amended Scheduling Order containing the extensionof the requested deadlines. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/12/2014. (tlg)
May 30, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting 78 Chesapeake Employers' Insurnce Company's Motion for Leave to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/30/2014. (cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friend v. Remac America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remac America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Molenda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Friend
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Represented By: Charles M. Love, IV
Represented By: Paula L. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]