Rahmi v. Sovereign Bank

Defendant: Sovereign Bank
Plaintiff: Alex D. Rahmi
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00087
Filed: August 31, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Gina M. Groh
Referring Judge: David J. Joel
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 14 Featured Case ROSEBORO NOTICE: re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sovereign Bank. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any amended response to the motion. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/8/2012. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2012: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
February 1, 2013 19 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS granting 6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs 1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment on this matter. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/1/2013. Copy mailed to pro ce plaintiff by CMRR.(cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2013: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
March 28, 2013 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 22 TO AMEND FEBRUARY 1, 2013 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/28/2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
April 12, 2013 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 27 SECOND MOTION TO AMEND FEBRUARY 1, 2013 25 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 4/12/2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
May 13, 2013 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION 30 TO AMEND AND ALTER ORDER 28 AND ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff has 14 days of receipt of this Order to show cause that he complied with Rule 11(b) of the FRCP. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/13/2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rahmi v. Sovereign Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovereign Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex D. Rahmi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]