Miller v. Huntington National Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Gary Miller
Defendant: Huntington National Bank, N.A., Huntington Mortgage Group, Frank Bradley, Appraisal Associates, Lori Snively and John Doe Note Holder
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00114
Filed: September 26, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gina M. Groh
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1452 Removal of Claim in Civil Action Related to BK. Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court of the Northern District of West Virginia and that this case be stricken from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/26/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/26/2012.]
February 15, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING BANKRUPTCY TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE granting 42 Motion to Intervene by Robert Trumble, Trustee. Robert Trumble added as Intervenor. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/15/2013. (cwm)
July 26, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ABSTAINING FROM AND REMANDING CASE granting 8 MOTION by Gary Miller to Abstain and Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. The Court hereby ABSTAINS from hearing this case, and it is accordingly REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/26/2013. Copy of docket sheet and order mailed to Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia.(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miller v. Huntington National Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Miller
Represented By: Jonathan R. Marshall
Represented By: Michael B. Hissam
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kara Cunningham Williams
Represented By: Kara C. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Mortgage Group
Represented By: Kara C. Williams
Represented By: Kara Cunningham Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Bradley
Represented By: Bryan N. Price
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Wakefield
Represented By: Danielle M. Waltz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appraisal Associates
Represented By: Bryan N. Price
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Wakefield
Represented By: Danielle M. Waltz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Snively
Represented By: Kara C. Williams
Represented By: Kara Cunningham Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Note Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]