Evans v. North et al

Plaintiff: Michelle N. Evans
Defendant: Patrolman North, The City of Martinsburg, WV, Cpl. Albaugh, Patrolman Gibbons and Sgt. Phelps
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00011
Filed: February 1, 2013
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Berkeley
Presiding Judge: Gina M. Groh
Referring Judge: David J. Joel
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 15 DISMISSING THE CITY OF MARTINSBURG AS DEFENDANT. Said Deft. is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/13/2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
September 25, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 46 OF THE 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT. The following Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice: City Manager, Mark Baldwin; Martinsburg City Council members during 3/17/12: Gregg Watchtel, Rodney Woods, Roger L ewis, Betty Gunnoe, Dennis Etherington, Max Parkinson and Richard Yauger; Mayor George Karos; 3/17/12 4 p.m.-12 a.m. shift supervisor - John Doe and Chief of Police, Kevin Miller terminated. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/25/2013. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2013: # 1 certified mail receipt) (tlg).
June 9, 2014 83 Featured Case ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION 73 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERT. Objections may be filed within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 6/9/2014. (tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evans v. North et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle N. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrolman North
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Martinsburg, WV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Albaugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrolman Gibbons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Phelps
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]