Smith et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Levert Smith and Nelson D. Radford
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company and Nationwide Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv00086
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Wheeling Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL***SEALED***; LIFTING STAY as to production of documents requested to be produced under seal; Af firming 100 Order, which Grants in Part and Denies in Part 70 Motion To Compel; and Denying as Moot 110 Motion; Defendants to produce (not under seal) Documents listed within 5 days of date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/22/14. (soa) Modified on 8/22/2014 to unseal document and regenerate NEF (soa).
December 16, 2014 211 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANYSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL ANDDENYING THE PENDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE AS MOOT: 173 Motion for Summary Judgment GRANTED. Following pending motions in limine are DENIED AS MOOT: 181 Motion in Limine; 188 Motion in Limine; 196 Motion in Limine; 197 Motion in Limine; 198 Motion in Limine; 199 Motion in Limine; 200 Motion in Limine; 201 Motion in Limine; [ 202] Motion in Limine; 203 Motion in Limine; 204 Motion in Limine; and 205 Motion in Limine; 192 Motion to Seal is GRANTED (exhibits sealed). This civil action is DIMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Clerk directed to enter Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 12/16/14. (cc) Modified on 12/16/2014 to add to text: the pretrial conference and trial are VACATED. (cc).
September 12, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO TERMINATE ATTORNEY STAPLES AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. Attorney Dwight J. Staples terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/12/2012. (kac) (Copy to Attorney Staples via US Mail)
October 4, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 35 Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/4/12. (cc)
December 2, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURTDENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE. re 4 Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICEto refiling if proper upon further discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 12/2/13. (cc)
January 22, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 8 DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS. Accordingly, Count II of the plaintiffs' complaint is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 1/22/2014. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levert Smith
Represented By: Dwight J. Staples
Represented By: Patrick S. Cassidy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson D. Radford
Represented By: Dwight J. Staples
Represented By: Patrick S. Cassidy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara J. Keefer
Represented By: Karen E Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barbara J. Keefer
Represented By: Karen E Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara J. Keefer
Represented By: Karen E Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]