Clay v. Consol Pennsylvania Coal Company

Plaintiff: Tony B. Clay
Defendant: Consol Pennsylvania Coal Company
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00092
Filed: June 21, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Wheeling Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 143 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS 133 OBJECTIONS TOTHE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 134 MOTION TO STAY THE ORDER AS MOOT. AFFIRMS the magistrate judges order granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs motion to enter onto land, and denying defendants motion for a protective order 113 . Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 5/15/13. (mji)
July 3, 2013 263 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT DENYING DEFENDANTS 7 MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AS MOOT ANDGRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 18 MOTION TO DISMISSPLAINTIFF' S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/3/13. (mji)
July 18, 2013 291 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING THE PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THIS COURT ON JULY 17, 2013 AFFIRMING BUT MODIFYING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS. The magistrate judge's order granting in part the defendants' motion for protective order 236 is AFFIRMED BUT MODIFIED and the defendants' objections 269 are OVERRULED. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 7/18/2013. (copy to all counsel of record via CM/ECF)(nmm)
July 18, 2013 292 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING THE PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THIS COURT ON JULY 17, 2013 GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE OF DAVID J. DELFIANDRA, ESQ. re 275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J. DelFiandra terminated from case. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 7/18/2013. (copy to all counsel of record via CM/ECF)(nmm)
July 23, 2013 300 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THIS COURT AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER 198 GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S REASONABLE EXPENSES BUT REMANDING TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION AND POSSIBLE RE CALCULATION OF THE FEES AND EXPENSES TO BE AWARDED. The magistrate judge's order granting in part plaintiff's reasonable expenses 198 is hereby AFFIRMED but REMANDED to the magistrate judge for further consideration and possible recalculation of the fees and expenses to be awarded. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 7/23/2013. (copy to all counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
September 10, 2013 363 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 307 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST CONSOL ENERGY, INC. FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/10/2013. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF)(nmm)
September 11, 2013 366 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS A SANCTION BE DENIED AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN P ART. The magistrate judge's report and recommendation that plaintiff's motion for default judgment as a sanction be denied and order that plaintiff's motion for sanctions be granted in part and denied in part 324 is hereby ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Accordingly, the plaintiff's motion for sanctions 279 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/11/2013. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
September 11, 2013 367 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER ON REASONABLE EXPENSES. This Court AFFIRMS the magistrate judge's order on reasonable expenses 334 , and OVERRULES the plaintiffs objections 340 . Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/11/2013. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
September 13, 2013 369 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING 333 THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER ON THE PRODUCTION OF IN CAMERA DOCUMENTS AND OVERRULING THE 341 DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS. Accordingly, the defendants are ORDERED to produce the documents listed above within 5 days of the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/13/2013. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
September 25, 2013 381 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 376 MOTION TO STAY THIS COURTS ORDER AFFIRMING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER ON THE PRODUCTION OF IN CAMERA DOCUMENTS. The defendants are ORDERED to produce the documents on or before Monday, September 30, 2013 by 5:00 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/25/2013. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
September 25, 2013 382 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING 294 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION SEEKING THE REVOCATION OF RICHARD CROMER'S PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION AND OTHER SANCTIONS BUT RECOMMENDING PUBLICLY REPRIMANDING RICHARD CROME R FOR HIS CONDUCT AT PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this memorandum opinion and order as well as a copy of Magistrate Judge Seibert's report and recommendation (ECF No. 294) to the Disciplinary Board of the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/25/2013. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF; copy to Attorney Cromer and Disciplinary Bd. of PA via U.S. Mail) (nmm) Modified docket text on 9/25/2013 (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clay v. Consol Pennsylvania Coal Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony B. Clay
Represented By: Patrick S. Casey
Represented By: Sandra M. Chapman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consol Pennsylvania Coal Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]