Pizzuto v. Smith et al

Defendant: James P. Mazzone, Arthur M. Recht, Ronald E. Wilson, D. L. Robinson, Scott R. Smith, Keith C. Gamble, Stephen M. Fowler, D. Luke Furbee, S. A. Zimmerman, Toni VanCamp, Kenneth W. Blake and Julie L. Kreefer
Plaintiff: Carol L. Gray Pizzuto
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00149
Filed: October 4, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Wheeling Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: James E. Seibert
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUMN OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND IMPOSING FILING RESTRICTIONS: Granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 31 Motion to Impose Filing Restricti ons ; Granting 33 Motion for the Imposition of Filing Restrictions ; Adopting Report and Recommendations re 73 and 100 Reports and Recommendations ; Denying 7 Motion to Disqualify Judge; Denying 7 Motion for Hearing; Denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration ; Denying 8 Motion for Hearing; Denying as moot 102 Motion for Hearing; Denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration ; Denying 104 Motion For Introduction of Evidence ; Denying 9 Motion for Hearing; Granting 20 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in part and Denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is Enjoined from filing further civil actions in this Court which are related to any prior lawsuits without obtaining leave of court. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/1/13. (copy to Pltff by cert. mail)(soa)
April 23, 2014 198 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BE GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BE DENIED & ORDER ON PENDING NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS: Denying 157 MOTION to Compel filed by Carol L. Gray Pizzut o, Denying 172 MOTION for Sanctions filed by S. A. Zimmerman, Denying 196 MOTION For Contempt of Court Against Defendant Zimmerman filed by Carol L. Gray Pizzuto, Denying 174 MOTION to Compel filed by Carol L. Gray Pizzuto; Denyin g 177 MOTION to Strike; Denying 169 MOTION To Retain Experts filed by S. A. Zimmerman; Denying 186 MOTION to Strike ; Denying 187 MOTION to Strike 165 Memorandum in Support of Motion; and Denying 158 MOTION to Strik e 154 Objections. RECOMMENDING Granting of 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by S. A. Zimmerman, Denial as Moot of 189 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Carol L. Gray Pizzuto; Denial of 166 MOTI ON to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Carol L. Gray Pizzuto; Denial as Moot of 188 MOTION to Amend/Correct 143 Scheduling Order, filed by Carol L. Gray Pizzuto. Written objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 4/23/14. (soa)(copy to pltff by cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
April 29, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND AFFIRMING ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Affirming M/J's order Denying plaintiff's motion to compel discovery and for sanctions; and Overruling plaintiff's objections to that order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 4/29/14. (copy to pltff by cert. mail)(soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
May 22, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SCHEDULING MOTIONS, OVERRULING OBJECTIONS, AFFIRMING ORDER OF THE MA GISTRATE JUDGE AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE AND ADMISSION OF EVIDENCE: Granting 164 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 166 Motion to Amend/Correct; Denying as moot 188 Mo tion to Amend/Correct; Denying as moot 189 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Adopting Report and Recommendations re 198 Report and Recommendations for 198 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Publ ic Motion, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Hearing, Report and Recommendations; Denying 204 Motion for Discovery; Denying 205 Motion to Strike ; re 198 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 158 MOTION to Strike 154 Obj ections, 155 Objections filed by Carol L. Gray Pizzuto, 177 MOTION to Strike 169 MOTION To Retain Experts filed by S. A. Zimmerman, 188 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Clerk directed to enter judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 5/22/14. (soa)(copy to Pltff by cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pizzuto v. Smith et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Mazzone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur M. Recht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. L. Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith C. Gamble
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Luke Furbee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. A. Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni VanCamp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth W. Blake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L. Kreefer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L. Gray Pizzuto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]