King v. Sears Roebuck & Company

Plaintiff: James A. King
Defendant: Sears Roebuck & Company
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv01024
Filed: August 16, 2010
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Bluefield Office
County: Kanawha
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 77:7777
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 157 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court GRANTS Anderson and Weiler's 90 MOTION for Sanctions. The Court ORDERS that the claims against Defendants Anderson Products, Inc. and Weiler Corporation be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court ORDERS An derson and Weiler to submit a statement of reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, with supporting documentation and explanation, within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs' counsel shall respond with any objection thereto within fifteen (15) days of receipt of same. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/22/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mjp)
February 22, 2013 158 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: the Court finds that Defendants' Joint 138 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses should be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and Plaintiffs' 145 MOTION for Modification of the Scheduling Order should be DENIED. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/22/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mjp)
March 7, 2013 163 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendant Black & Decker's 52 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED; Defendant Black & Decker's 58 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of Plaintif fs' Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED, and Defendants Anderson Products' and Weiler Corporation's 62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED and all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice except Plaintiffs' claim of intentional misconduct against Sears. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 3/7/2013. (cc: counsel of record) (mjp)
February 14, 2011 20 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Thomas Hayslett from this case; denying Plaintiffs' 8 MOTION to Remand to Circuit Court. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 2/14/2011. (cc: counsel of record) (mjp)
June 27, 2011 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Amend Complaint and Join Parties with respect to all proposed changes. Plaintiffs are given ten (10) days to file an amended complaint with the court. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 6/27/2011. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: King v. Sears Roebuck & Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck & Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]