Richardson et al v. The Church of God International

Defendant: David Harris, Lydge Burns, Terry Smith, Gene Harris, Roy Norman Gray, Wayne Wicker, The Pineville Church of God, The Church of God International, Pat Armstrong, Kathy Zaferatos, Jerry Zaferatos and Zaferatos, LLC
Plaintiff: John Stephens, Harold Richardson and Teresa Richardson
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv21821
Filed: January 6, 2014
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Bluefield Office
County: McDowell
Presiding Judge: David A. Faber
Referring Judge: R. Clarke VanDervort
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants Kathy Zaferatos, Jerry Zaferatos and Zaferatos, LLC's 25 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 9/11/2014. (cc: all counsel of record) (arb)
August 20, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 35 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk Against Pat Armstrong; denying Plaintiffs' 36 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk Against David Harris and denying Plaintiffs' 47 RENEWED MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk Against Pat Armstrong. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 8/20/2014. (cc: all counsel of record) (arb)
August 22, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Plaintiffs' 55 Response is deemed timely. The Court GRANTS The Pineville Church of God, Pastor Roy Norman Gray, Gene Harris and Lydge Burns' 23 MOTION to Dismiss; GRANTS Bishop Wayne Wicker's 27 MOTION to Dismiss; GRANTS Terry Smith's 29 MOTION to Dismiss; GRANTS The Church of God International's 33 MOTION to Dismiss and GRANTS David Harris 9; 43 MOTION to Dismiss. As to these Defendants, this action is dismissed. Nothing in this Memorandum Opinion and Order affects the remaining Defendants - Pat Armstrong, Kathy Zaferatos, Jerry Zaferatos and Zaferatos, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 8/22/2014. (cc: all counsel of record) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Richardson et al v. The Church of God International
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydge Burns
Represented By: John L. MacCorkle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donna S. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Smith
Represented By: John L. MacCorkle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donna S. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Harris
Represented By: John L. MacCorkle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donna S. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Norman Gray
Represented By: John L. MacCorkle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donna S. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Wicker
Represented By: Lou Ann S. Cyrus
Represented By: Callie E. Waers(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pineville Church of God
Represented By: John L. MacCorkle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donna S. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Church of God International
Represented By: Rita Massie Biser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Zaferatos
Represented By: Darl W. Poling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Zaferatos
Represented By: Darl W. Poling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaferatos, LLC
Represented By: Darl W. Poling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]