Jefferson County Commission et al v. Tennant et al

Plaintiff: Dale Manuel, Jefferson County Commission and Patricia Noland
Defendant: Natalie Tennant, Earl Ray Tomblin, Jeffrey Kessler and Richard Thompson
Intervenor_plaintiff: Thornton Cooper
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00989
Filed: December 15, 2011
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: John Preston Bailey
1 Judge: Irene C. Berger
2 Judge: Robert Bruce King
 
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER concluding that West Virginia's congressional apportionment was not accomplished in conformance with the Constitution of the United States; the plaintiffs are entitled to have the enactment declared null and void, an d to have the Secretary of State permanently enjoined from conducting West Virginia's elections for Congress in accordance therewith; pursuant to the foregoing herein, the Court is compelled to declare S.B. 1008, as codified at West Virginia Cod e Section 1-2-3, in contravention of the Constitution of the United States; the enforcement of said section by the defendants is permanently enjoined; the 2012 congressional elections will be conducted under an interim plan promulgated by the Court, subject to the following conditions set forth herein; in the absence of successful compliance with one of the foregoing conditions herein, the Court will, on or after January 17, 2012, be constrained to identify an interim plan for use in the 2012 co ngressional elections in West Virginia from among those currently in the record of this case, either the so-called "Perfect Plan" or Cooper Plan 4; any interim plan adopted by the Court may be substituted for and superseded by the Legislatu re and the Governor, so long as such substitution complies with the applicable constitutional mandate. The Court will retain jurisdiction in this case for such other and further proceedings as may be appropriate pending further order. Signed by United States Circuit Judge Robert Bruce King and United States District Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/3/2012. (cc: attys) (taq)
January 3, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court DISSENTING OPINION agreeing that the plaintiffs have satisfied the first prong of Karcher - showing a variance from exact equality which could be avoided; disagreeing that the State has failed to demonstrate a proper justification for the variance; c oncluding that the State has violated neither Article I, § 2 of the Constitution of the United States nor Article I, § 4 of the Constitution of West Virginia; concluding that the second congressional district is compact as required by Article I, § 4 of the Constitution of West Virginia. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey, WVN, on 1/3/2012. (cc: attys) (taq)
January 4, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER concluding that West Virginia's congressional apportionment was not accomplished in conformance with the Constitution of the United States; the plaintiffs are entitled to have the enactment declared null and void, a nd to have the Secretary of State permanently enjoined from conducting West Virginia's elections for Congress in accordance therewith; pursuant to the foregoing herein, the Court is compelled to declare S.B. 1008, as codified at West Virginia Co de Section 1-2-3, in contravention of the Constitution of the United States; the enforcement of said section by the defendants is permanently enjoined; the 2012 congressional elections will be conducted under an interim plan promulgated by the Court, subject to the following conditions set forth herein; in the absence of successful compliance with one of the foregoing conditions herein, the Court will, on or after January 17, 2012, be constrained to identify an interim plan for use in the 2012 c ongressional elections in West Virginia from among those currently in the record of this case, either the so-called "Perfect Plan" or Cooper Plan 4; any interim plan adopted by the Court may be substituted for and superseded by the Legislat ure and the Governor, so long as such substitution complies with the applicable constitutional mandate. The Court will retain jurisdiction in this case for such other and further proceedings as may be appropriate pending further order. Signed by United States Circuit Judge Robert Bruce King and United States District Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/4/2012. (cc: attys) (taq)
January 25, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL the Supreme Court's 85 Judgment being dispositive of Count One of plaintiffs' Complaint, which asserts a numerical equivalence claim under Article I, § 2 of, and the Equal Protection Clause of the Four teenth Amendment to, the Constitution of the United States, and of the same claim comprising part of Count One of the intervening plaintiff's Complaint, Judgment on both claims is entered on behalf of the defendants. Construing defendants' suggestion to dismiss the remaining claims to allow them to proceed in State Court as a motion to dismiss, granting defendants' motion and Dismissing Counts Two and Three of plaintiffs' Complaint, together with the remainder of Count One of the intervening plaintiff's Complaint, without prejudice to refiling in the appropriate state court. Signed by United States Circuit Judge Robert Bruce King on 1/25/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jefferson County Commission et al v. Tennant et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Manuel
Represented By: Stephen G. Skinner
Represented By: David M. Hammer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County Commission
Represented By: Stephen G. Skinner
Represented By: David M. Hammer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Noland
Represented By: Stephen G. Skinner
Represented By: David M. Hammer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Tennant
Represented By: Thomas W. Rodd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Ray Tomblin
Represented By: Thomas W. Rodd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Kessler
Represented By: George E. Carenbauer
Represented By: Adam B. Tomlinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thompson
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Cynthia A. Majestro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Thornton Cooper
Represented By: Stuart Thornton Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]