Mey et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al

Defendant: ISI Alarms NC, Inc. and Honeywell International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01721
Filed: May 29, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 90 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 98 MOTION to Amend Complaint; granting plaintiff's 98 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order; granting in part and denying in par t plaintiff's 113 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order; Discovery due01/02/2014; Dispositive motions due 02/03/2014; Class certification motions due04/02/2014. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/13/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
October 23, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the parties' 131 RENEWED JOINT MOTION to Seal provisionally pending the further order of the court; defendant Honeywell International, Inc., is directed to file the redacted version of the subject depos ition transcript on the public record by 10/31/2013; the court will revisit the matter of sealing in the event that a subsequent request to unseal is received. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/23/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
March 29, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Honeywell International, Inc's 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/29/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mey et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISI Alarms NC, Inc.
Represented By: Harry F. Bell, Jr.
Represented By: Helen Mac Murray
Represented By: Robert B. Newkirk, II
Represented By: Jonathan W. Price
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Alysa Hutnik
Represented By: Alexander Macia
Represented By: Leah P. Macia
Represented By: Lauri A. Mazzuchetti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Represented By: Jonathan R. Marshall
Represented By: Edward A. Broderick
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Matthew P. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]