Thompson v. Kanawha County Commission et al

Defendant: Kent Carper, Hoppy Shores, Dave Hardy, Kanawha County' Clerks Office, Vera McCormick, City of Charleston West Virginia City Council Members, James M. Reishman, Natalie Tenant, Tim Leach, Charleston Gazette Newspaper, Charleston Daily Mail Newspaper, Rod Blackstone, Deitzler, Kanawha County Commission, Flaherty, Paul Ellis and City of Charleston West Virginia
Plaintiff: Janet L. Thompson
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01945
Filed: June 22, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Thomas E. Johnston
Referring Judge: Mary E. Stanley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's 52 MOTION to Void Final Order of Election Contest; pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a), the parties shall have 14 days from the date of filing this Memorandum Opinion and Order within which to file written objections; extension of time period may be granted by the presiding District Judge for good cause shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary E. Stanley on 8/30/2012. (cc: Plaintiff; attys) (tmh)
March 25, 2013 89 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER overruling plaintiff's 87 , 88 Objections; adopting the 83 , 84 Proposed Findings and Recommendation; granting the Charleston Defendants' 43 Motion to Dismiss and Defendants Natalie Tenant's and Tim Leach's 26 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 22 Amended Complaint; and directing this case removed from the Court's Docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/25/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
May 28, 2013 95 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER pursuant to plaintiff's 91 MOTION for new trial and requesting the Court reconsider its 3/25/2013 89 Memorandum Opinion and Order and 90 Judgment Order, upon consideration of said motion, the Court does not find any error contained in its 3/25/2013 Memorandum Opinion and Judgment Order, nor does it find that failing to grant the Rule 59(e) motion would result in manifest injustice to the plaintiff; plaintiff presents no extraordinary need or circumstance to justify such an extraordinary remedy. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 5/23/2013. (cc: plaintiff, pro se; attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thompson v. Kanawha County Commission et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Carper
Represented By: Harry G. Deitzler
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoppy Shores
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Hardy
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanawha County' Clerks Office
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera McCormick
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charleston West Virginia City Council Members
Represented By: Karen Tracy McElhinny
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Reishman
Represented By: Karen Tracy McElhinny
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Tenant
Represented By: Joanna I. Tabit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Leach
Represented By: Joanna I. Tabit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Gazette Newspaper
Represented By: Katherine R. Snow
Represented By: Sean P. McGinley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Daily Mail Newspaper
Represented By: Sean P. McGinley
Represented By: Katherine R. Snow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Blackstone
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Karen Tracy McElhinny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deitzler
Represented By: Harry G. Deitzler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanawha County Commission
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flaherty
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Wakefield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ellis
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Karen Tracy McElhinny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charleston West Virginia
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Karen Tracy McElhinny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]