Simpson v. City of Charleston et al

Defendant: City of Charleston and B. A. Lightner
Plaintiff: Cory A. Simpson
Case Number: 2:2013cv08766
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Referring Judge: Cheryl A. Eifert
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER and NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE denying Plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, and 20 MOTION to Supress all Evidence Favorable to the Plaintiff; directing that the following dates are fixed as dates and times by or on which certain events must occur: Last day to conduct Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/3/2013; Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/9/2013; Initial Conference set for 12/13/2013 at 11:00 AM in Huntington before Magistrat e Judge Cheryl A. Eifert; the parties are advised that the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P 14 and 15 with respect to the time in which to file third-party claims and to amend pleadings without leave of the court are not affected by this Order and Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/20/2013. (cc: Plaintiff; attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
December 12, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting and incorporating the 24 Proposed Findings and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; denying the 13 Motion to Dismiss as it pertains to Officer Lightner; granting said motion to dismiss, without prejudice, as it pertains to the City of Charleston; directing the City of Charleston removed from the style of this case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/12/2013. (cc: plaintiff; attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
September 9, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER SEALING EXHIBIT granting defendant's 77 motion to Seal Exhibit 2; due to the confidential nature of the information, directing Exhibit 2 to be sealed; the Court finds that sealing Exhibit 2 does not unduly or significantly prejudice the public's right to access court documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/9/2014. (cc: plaintiff, pro se; all counsel of record) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. City of Charleston et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charleston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. A. Lightner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory A. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]