Bellew v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dianne M. Bellew
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2013cv22473
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2014 236 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 180 EMERGENCY MOTION by Dianne M. Bellew for Protective Order and/or MOTION to Quash Notices of Deposition of Leo Stinnett, M.D. and Andrew Villa, M.D., granting Plaintiff's mo tion to quash the notice of deposition of Dr. Stinnett, but denying Plaintiff's motion to quash the notice of deposition of Dr. Villa. Defendants are granted leave to depose Dr. Villa beyond the discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/3/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 20, 2014 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 112 MOTION by Dianne M. Bellew for Partial Summary Judgment on Failure to Warn and Proximate Causation, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/20/2014. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) ts)
November 24, 2014 280 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Preemption) denying 124 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Preemption of Certain Claims. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/24/2014. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 24, 2014 281 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claims with Prejudice) denying 120 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claims With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/24/2014. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 24, 2014 282 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) granting in part and denying in part 105 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment on All Claims, as more fully set forth herein; and denying as moot 140 MOTION by Dianne M. Bellew to Strike or Exclude Defendants' Untimely Summary Judgment Filing. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/24/2014. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 24, 2014 283 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Separate Defenses) denying as moot in part and denying in part 133 MOTION by Dianne M. Bellew for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Ethicon, Inc.'s Separate Defenses, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/24/2014. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 25, 2014 287 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Motions in Limine) For the reasons stated herein, the following motions in limine are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: Ethicon's 206 Omnibus Motion in Limine; Plaintiff's 188 Omnibus Motions in Limine No s. 1-3 Limiting Defense Medical Experts; Plaintiff's 194 Omnibus Motions in Limine Nos. 14-20 Regarding General Issues; and the Plaintiff's 202 Omnibus Motions in Limine Nos. 32-34 Limiting FDA Related Evidence; the following motions a re GRANTED: Ethicon's 184 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Allegations of Spoliation and the Plaintiff's 277 Motion to Strike; the following motion is DENIED: Plaintiff's 200 Omnibus Motions in Limine Nos. 26-31 to Exclude Improper Opinion Testimony From Treating Physicians; the ruling on the following motion is RESERVED: Plaintiff's 185 Motion in Limine to Preclude Improper Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/25/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ras)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellew v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne M. Bellew
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock(Designation Retained)
Represented By: D. Renee Baggett(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Douglass Alan Kreis(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]