Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al

 
Case Number: 3:2005cv00784
Filed: September 22, 2005
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2009 461 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 459 MOTION to Stay all proceedings Regarding the Mingo Logan Coal Company's Spruce No. 1 Permit for 30 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/15/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
September 28, 2009 462 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 452 MOTION for costs as requested in the amount of $2,814.30. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/28/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
October 21, 2009 466 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 463 MOTION to Extend Stay of Proceedings Regarding the Mingo Logan Coal Company's Spruce No. 1 Permit until 11/4/2009. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/21/2009. (cc: attys) (gan)
April 22, 2010 486 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 481 MOTION to Stay of Proceedings regarding the Mingo Logan Coal Company's spruce No. 1 Permit; granting 485 MOTION to Supplement Response in Opposition to Corps of Engineers' Request for Indefinite Stay with Supporting Affidavit; the stay in this action is Ordered Extended for only so long as is required for the EPA to complete its administrative review under 404(c), or for 6 months, whichever is shorter; accordingly the Court Schedules a stat us conference on 10/04/2010, at 11 a.m. to address the status of the EPA's 404(c) review. In conformity with the previous stays, the extension shall not affect Mingo Logan's ability to conduct mining operations pursuant to the parties' earlier agreements. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/22/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
November 2, 2010 501 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 497 MOTION to Extend Stay of Proceedings Regarding the Mingo Logan Coal Company's Spruce No. 1 Permit for an additional 120 days (until 2/22/2011.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/2/2010. (cc: attys) (gan)
July 25, 2012 522 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 513 MOTION for Leave to File a Seventh Amended and Supplemental Complaint; Clerk directed to file the Seventh Amended Complaint and the parties are directed to file, within seven days, a proposed schedule for filing and resolving any motions for summary judgment relating to the Supplemental Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 7/25/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (dcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]