Roney et al v. Gencorp et al

 
Case Number: 3:2005cv00788
Filed: September 23, 2005
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 612 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The Court finds that West Virginia courts would adopt the sophisticated user and bulk supplier defenses in their application of comment n to Section 388 of the Restatement (Second) of Torts. The Court further finds the West Virginia law would not support and application of the open and obvious defense on the facts of this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/4/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (dcm)
September 14, 2009 630 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 501 MOTION in Limine; 511 Defendant's motion in Limine to Exclude Unauthenticated Documents, the Court Orders Plaintiff, by Friday, 09/18/2009 to perform the following tasks; 1. Narrow the list of exhibits; 2. Provide the basi s for authenticity of each; 3. Describe the purpose for which each exhibit will be offered; granting 513 MOTION in Limine; 519 Defendants' Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Statement Made by Non-Parties, the Court Orders Plaintiff, by Friday, 09/18/2009, to perform the following tasks; 1. Narrow the list of Exhibits; 2. Provide the basis for authenticity of each; 3. Describe the purpose for which each exhibit will be offered; Denying as moot 522 MOTION in Limine; g ranting 525 MOTION in Limine; denying 527 MOTION in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 529 MOTION in Limine; denying 531 MOTION in Limine; denying 536 MOTION in Limine; denying 538 MOTION in Limine; deferring ruling on 542 MOT ION to Bifurcate; denying 573 MOTION in Limine; denying 577 MOTION in Limine; taking under advisement 592 MOTION in Limine; granting 594 MOTION in Limine. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/14/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
September 16, 2009 637 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 592 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any argument reference or evidence relating to the duty to inspect or test. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/16/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
September 18, 2009 644 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 396 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Peter Infante; granting in part and denying in part 398 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Mr. James Jones; granting The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company's 400 M OTION for Summary Judgment; granting 411 Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc.'s MOTION for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 413 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Prof. Gerald Markowitz; granting PPG Industries, Inc.'s [43 5] MOTION for Summary Judgment on plaintiff's Fraud, Conspiracy, and Aiding and Abetting Claims; denying 440 PPG Industries, Inc.'s MOTION for Summary Judgment on plaintiff's Products Liability Claims; denying as moot Joint 542 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/18/2009. (cc: attys) (gan)
September 25, 2009 660 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER As to the 511 and 519 Motions in Limine to exclude Unauthenticated Documents and Hearsay, Plaintiff is Ordered to organize these documents, along with basis for authenticity and admissibility, and present them to the Court during the final settlement conference on Monday, 09/28/2009; granting 635 MOTION in Limine; denies the 640 MOTION in Limine, the Court Grants Defendant's request to amend its witness list, the Court, however, Orders, that this new witness be made available to Plaintiff for a discovery deposition, in Huntington, WV, before he may testify at trial; denying 648 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's 09/18/2009 Orders ; denying Plaintiff's 657 Pre-Trial Motion Regarding the Court's Orde r of 09/04/2009 and Defendant's Sophisticated User Defense; granting 658 MOTION for Certification and Authentication of WV Public Health Regulations First Published in 1961. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/25/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm) Modified on 9/28/2009 to add text (dcm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roney et al v. Gencorp et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]