Belcher v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Jason P. Belcher
Case Number: 3:2012cv04717
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A. Eifert
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 482 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 481 MOTION for an Order directing Movant to File a Privilege Waiver and an Order Directing Movant's Former Counsel to Provide Information to the United States Concerning Movan t's Claim of Ineffective Assistance of Counsel and an Abeyance as to Jason P. Belcher (3); the Court Orders Movant's trial counsel, Mr. Gary Collias, to file within 30 days from the date of this Order an Affidavit responding to Movant' s claims of ineffective assistance of counsel; the Court further Orders that the attorney-client privilege shall not be deemed automatically waived in any other Federal or State proceedings by virture of the above-ordered disclosure in this 2255 proc eeding; the Court Grants the United States' Motion for an abeyance and shall have 30 days after receipt of the affidavit and supporting documentation, and Movant shall have 45 days after service of the United States' Response to file a reply memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/1/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party, Mr. Gary Collias) (skm)
September 10, 2014 517 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Court Adopts 513 Proposed Findings and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge; grants 486 Motion to Strike filed by Jason P. Belcher; grants 500 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Jason P. Belcher; denies 474 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Jason P. Belcher; the Court Denies a certificate of appealability Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/10/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
November 20, 2014 523 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to Jason P. Belcher; the Court Adopts 513 Proposed Findings and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge; grants 486 Motion to Strike filed by Jason P. Belcher; grants 500 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Jason P. Belcher; denies [474 ] Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Jason P. Belcher; the Court also denies petitioner's request in his objections for an evidentiary hearing; the Court Denies a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/10/2014. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belcher v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason P. Belcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]