Jones v. F.C.I. Beckley Med. Staff Employees et al

Plaintiff: Steve Jones
Defendant: F.C.I. Beckley Med. Staff Employees, Mr. White, Mrs. Lilly and Mrs. Rose
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv00530
Filed: March 12, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Beckley Office
County: Raleigh
Presiding Judge: Irene C. Berger
Referring Judge: R. Clarke VanDervort
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the 43 Proposed Findings and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and ORDERS as follows: (1) the 30 First Amended Motion of the United States to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose and F rances Lilly and Substitute the United States is GRANTED; (2) the 16 Motion of the United States to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose and Frances Lilly and Substitute the United States is DENIED AS MOOT; the 18 Motion of the United Sta tes to Dismiss Medical Negligence Claims for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED; (4) the Defendants' 28 First Amended Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (5) the Defendants' 23 Motion to Di smiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT; and (6) this matter is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings regarding the Plaintiff's FTCA claim. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/11/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
October 15, 2013 60 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 48 "Objections and Traverse(s)," which the Corut construes as a Motion for Reconsideration, be GRANTED only to the extent that the Court has substantively reviewed his timely objections and arguments and DENIED to the extent that the motion asks the Court to alter its prior ruling; the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's objections to the 46 PF&R be OVERRULED; the Court REAFFIRMS its 47 Memorandum Opinion and Or der adopting the Magistrate's Proposed Findings and Recommendation.: (1) granting the United States' First Amended Motion to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose and Frances Lilly and Substitute the United States; (2) denying as moo t the United States' Motion to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose, and Frances Lilly and Substitute the United States; (3) granting the United States' Motion to Dismiss Medical Negligence Claims for Failure to State a Claim; and ( 4) granting the Defendants' First Amended Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; (5) denying as moot the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; and (6) referring this matter back to Magistrate Judge VanDervort for further proceedings regarding the Plaintiff's FTCA claim. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/15/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
April 1, 2014 70 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS and incorporates herein the findings and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as contained in the 69 Proposed Findings and Recommendation, and ORDERS that the United States' 61 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, the Plaintiff's 2 Complaint be DISMISSED, and that this action be REMOVED from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 04/01/2014. (cc: USMJ VanDervort; attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
June 30, 2014 74 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court does ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's 69 Proposed Findings and Recommendation dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint be ADOPTED, that the Plaintiff's 72 Objections to the PF&R be OVERRULED, and t hat the Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the Court ORDERS that the Plaintiff's renewed Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Motion for a Jury Trial, contained at the end of his objections, be DENIED; the Court ORDERS that the 73 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to FRCVP 59(e) be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/30/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jones v. F.C.I. Beckley Med. Staff Employees et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.C.I. Beckley Med. Staff Employees
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Lilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]