Williams v. Schoeder

Petitioner: Clyde B Williams
Respondent: Bruce Schoeder
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00572
Filed: June 15, 2011
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
 
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying re 9 Original Document - Motion for Reconsideration; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/06/2011. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Clyde Williams)(Griesbach, William)
August 5, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and denying 21 Motion for Order; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 08/04/2011. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Clyde Williams) (Griesbach, William)
June 27, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DISMISSING this action for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 06/27/2011. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Clyde Williams) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams v. Schoeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clyde B Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bruce Schoeder
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]