Menasha Corporation et al v. United States Department of Justice

Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Neenah-Menasha Sewerage Commission and Menasha Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00682
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 01/25/2012. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
March 26, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER denying 24 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 03/26/2012. SEE DECISION AND ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
April 3, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Stipulation filed by United States Department of Justice signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/03/2012. The Court hereby STAYS the Court's Order dated January 26, 2012 23 , during the pendency of the appeal in this case or until further Order of this Court. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menasha Corporation et al v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neenah-Menasha Sewerage Commission
Represented By: Kevin J Lyons
Represented By: Tara M Mathison
Represented By: Elizabeth K Miles
Represented By: William J Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menasha Corporation
Represented By: David A Rabbino
Represented By: Philip C Hunsucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.