Schroeder et al v. Humana Inc et al

Plaintiff: Diane Schroeder and Rebecca Schroeder
Defendant: Humana Inc and Humana Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00137
Filed: February 8, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Outagamie
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
 
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 28 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH PROVISO signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/29/2012. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 11, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/11/2012 denying 45 Motion to Quash Subpoenas. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
October 25, 2012 50 Featured Case ORDER denying 38 Motion to Seal Document; denying 41 Motion to Seal Document; denying 29 Motion to Seal Document, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/25/2012. The documents will remain under seal for a period often days. If defendant believes that there are facts that would establish good cause for continuing them under seal, the Court will reconsider. Otherwise, the Clerk is directed to unseal these documents after ten days. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
November 27, 2012 52 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 42 Motion to Supplement the Record; GRANTING 30 Motion to Certify Class and Approving Notice to Potential Fair Labor Standards Act Plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/27/2012. Within 20 days of the date of this order Humana will produce to plaintiffs a computer readable data file containing the name, last known address and telephone number, dates of employment, and social security number (last four digits only) for all current and former cl inical nurse advisors who primarily performed utilization management functions (prospective reviews, retrospective claims reviews, or inpatient reviews in roles as acute case manager or concurrent review with discharge planning) since November 27, 20 09.Plaintiffs are authorized to give notice of this lawsuit to all current and former clinical nurse advisors who primarily performed utilization management functions (prospective reviews, retrospective claims reviews, or inpatient reviews in roles a s acute case manager or concurrent review with discharge planning) since November 27, 2009, in the finalized notice form approved by this Court and attached hereto. Such notice may be sent once via first class mail to the conditionally-certified class. SEE DECISION AND ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Pendency of Lawsuit) (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schroeder et al v. Humana Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Schroeder
Represented By: Robert L Schug
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Schroeder
Represented By: Robert L Schug
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Inc
Represented By: Tony H McGrath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Insurance Company
Represented By: Tony H McGrath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]