Ratajczak et al v. Beazley Solutions Limited et al

Defendant: Beazley Furlonge Limited and Beazley Solutions Limited
Plaintiff: Angela Ratajczak, Elizabeth Ratajczak, Daniel J Ratajczak, Jr and Scott A Ratajczak
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00045
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Kewaunee
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William Griesbach dated July 7, 2014, granting 87 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Plaintiffs claims against Mesirow are also dismissed without prejudice--but Plaintiffs related request for costs, expenses, and attorneys fees pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1927 is denied as moot; granting 98 Beazleys Motion for Reconsideration or to drop R-T Specialty as a party in order to preserve the Courts subject matter jurisdiction and R-T Specialty is dismissed w ithout prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21; granting 100 parties joint motion to bifurcate and Discovery relating to Plaintiffs bad faith claims, as embodied in Counts V and VI of the Third Amended Complaint, is stayed pending resolution of Pl aintiffs other claims. Discovery otherwise permissible in connection with Plaintiffs coverage claims will not be precluded simply because that discovery might also be relevant to, or might lead to the discovery of evidence relevant to, Plaintiffs ba d faith claims. All currently scheduled deadlines are hereby suspended, and the parties shall present a proposed revised pretrial schedule within ten (10) days of entry of this order. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
May 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer And For Default Judgment, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 05/15/2013. The court directs defendants, within thirty (30) days, to supplement the record showing that it has funds o r securities sufficient and available to satisfy any probable final judgment or in the alternative to otherwise comply with its obligations as set forth in §618.47(1). Should defendants fail to comply with its obligations under §618.47 within the time allotted, the Ratajczaks may renew their motion to strike. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
June 17, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER granting Beazley Furlonge Limited's 9 MOTION to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 6/17/2013. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 23, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Seal; granting 45 Motion to Seal, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/23/2013. Docket Nos. 39 and 39-1 will remain sealed. Beazley's coverage denial letter at Docket 47 will also remain sealed for now. See Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ratajczak et al v. Beazley Solutions Limited et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Furlonge Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Solutions Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ratajczak
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ratajczak
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Ratajczak, Jr
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A Ratajczak
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]