US Bank NA v. Long

Plaintiff: US Bank NA
Defendant: Jeffrey S Long
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00257
Filed: March 7, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 23 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 5/19/2014 granting 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the amount of $704,266.13, plus accruing daily interest of $125.42 from January 17, 2014 to the date of this order. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
July 3, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 07/03/2014. The Clerk is directed to enter an amended judgment adding attorneys fees of $53,285.00 and expenses of $8,513.85 to the previous judgment in the amount of $704,266.13. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
July 8, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER re 30 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 07/08/2014. An amended judgment is not entered for an award of costs and fees post-judgment (see Budinich v. Becton Dickinson & Co., 486 U.S. 196, 202 (198 8); see also Exch. Natl Bank v. Daniels, 763 F.2d 286, 29394 (7th Cir. 1985)), therefore an amended judgment will not be entered. Rather, the fees and costs will be imposed by this order and Defendant shall pay the Banks reasonable attorneys fees in the amount of $53,285.00 and costs in the amount of $8,513.85. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: US Bank NA v. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank NA
Represented By: Kevin L Ferguson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]