Marine Travelift Inc v. ASCOM SpA et al

Plaintiff: Marine Travelift Inc
Defendant: ASCOM SpA and International Boatlift Exchange Inc
Case Number: 1:2014cv00443
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Door
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 126 Motion to Seal portions of the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/24/2014. The plaintiff will be allowed 21 days within which to show cause why the material it designated confidential should remain under seal. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
February 3, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 2-3-15 denying 46 Motion to Strike ; granting 72 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 108 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 109 Motion for Sanctions; denying 118 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 21 Motion to Seal Document. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
April 21, 2015 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on claim construction signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 4-21-15. Plaintiff may respond to the Defendants motion for partial summary judgment on or before May 15, 2015. A reply, if any, may be filed by May 31, 2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 27, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 06/27/2014. The Court is unaware of any authority for destroying material contained within the public record. The parties may either submit a revised protective order or provide some authority for the provision requiring destruction of materials filed with the court. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
August 25, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 8-25-14 denying 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marine Travelift Inc v. ASCOM SpA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Travelift Inc
Represented By: Kenneth M Albridge, III
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Patrick G McBride
Represented By: Ian AJ Pitz
Represented By: John C Scheller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCOM SpA
Represented By: Jonathan D Jay
Represented By: Carol R Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Boatlift Exchange Inc
Represented By: Jonathan D Jay
Represented By: Carol R Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]