Edgenet Inc v. GS1 AIBSL et al

Plaintiff: Edgenet Inc
Defendant: GS1 AIBSL, GS1 US Inc, 1Sync Inc and American Hardware Manufacturers Association
Case Number: 2:2009cv00065
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Waukesha
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/27/11: granting 87 defendant GS1 AISBL's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DISMISSING for want of personal jurisdiction Counts Six and Seven of 43 the Second Amended Complaint as against defendant GS1 AISBL; and terminating defendant GS1 AISBL. (cc: all counsel)(nm)
January 5, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/5/10 granting 33 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; denying 8 AHMA's Motion to Dismiss; denying 10 GS1 US and 1Sync's Motion to Dismiss; denying 14 GS1 AIBSL's Motion to Dismiss. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
September 27, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/27/10 granting in part and denying in part 56 defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Counts One, Two, Three, Four, Five, Eight, Nine, and Ten of 43 plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
April 1, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/1/11 denying 69 plaintiff's Motion for Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b). See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgenet Inc v. GS1 AIBSL et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgenet Inc
Represented By: Sandy Swartzberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS1 AIBSL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS1 US Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1Sync Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Hardware Manufacturers Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]