Carter v. Merrill et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Carter
Defendant: Joseph Merrill, Edward A Flynn, City of Milwaukee Police Department and John Does
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00396
Filed: May 10, 2010
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/7/14 that the deadline for filing all pretrial motions, including dispositive motions and motions in limine, is August 15, 2014. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
June 2, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/2/11 granting 19 Motion to Dismiss City of Milwaukee Police Dept. as defendant. Further ordering that the caption be amended to reflect that the City of Milwaukee is a defendant and that the City has until August 1, 2011 to move to dismiss the remaining claim against the City. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
February 5, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/5/13 denying 54 Motion to Strike. Further ordering that defendants have until 2/20/13 to either file an amended or supplemental reply in support of their motion for partial summary judgment or advise the court that they do not wish to amend their pleading. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to Atty. Brittain) (dm)
February 27, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/27/13 that defendants motion for summary judgment 47 is DENIED with respect to plaintiffs claims against Merrill and GRANTED with respect to his claims against Behning and Timm. Further ordering that the claims against defendants John Does 13 are DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carter v. Merrill et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Carter
Represented By: Christopher D Stombaugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Merrill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A Flynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milwaukee Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]