National Exchange Bank and Trust v. Petro-Chemical Systems Inc et al

Defendant: Petro-Chemical Systems Inc, Mid-Continent Casualty, Tanknology Inc and Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: National Exchange Bank and Trust
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00134
Filed: February 3, 2011
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Fond du Lac
Presiding Judge: Aaron E Goodstein
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2014 183 Featured Case ORDER re 135 Petition for RCRA Recoverable Attorney Fees and Costs, filed by National Exchange Bank and Trust, 150 Supplemental Fee Petition, filed by National Exchange Bank and Trust. Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 6972(e), defendant Tanknology, Inc., and its insurers, Zurich American Insurance Company and Steadfast Insurance Company, shall pay to the plaintiff a total of $696,720.60. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aaron E Goodstein on 3/19/2014. (cc: all counsel)(djo)
December 3, 2012 77 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Aaron E Goodstein on 12/3/2012 denying 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cc: all counsel) (djo)
May 1, 2013 83 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Aaron E Goodstein on 5/1/2013 denying 79 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel) (djo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: National Exchange Bank and Trust v. Petro-Chemical Systems Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro-Chemical Systems Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Continent Casualty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanknology Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Exchange Bank and Trust
Represented By: Donald P Gallo
Represented By: Pamela H Schaefer
Represented By: Carolyn A Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]