Frank et al v. Walker et al

Defendant: Lynne B Judd, Kristina Boardman, Donald Reincke, Tracy Jo Howard, Sandra M Brisco, Barney L Hall, Donald J Genin, Jill Louis Geoffroy, Patricia A Nelson, Mark Gottlieb, Kevin J Kennedy, Nathaniel E Robinson, Scott Walker, Thomas Barland, Gerald Nichol, Michael Brennan, Thomas Cane, David G Deininger and Timothy Vocke
Plaintiff: Max Kligman, Samantha Meszaros, Steve Kvasnicka, Sarah Lahti, Domonique Whitehurst, Edward Hogan, Ruthelle Frank, Carl Ellis, Justin Luft, Dartric Davis, Barbara Oden, Sandra Jashinski, Anthony Sharp, Pamela Dukes, Anthony Judd, Anna Shea and Matthew Dearing
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01128
Filed: December 13, 2011
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
 
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 103 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/12/12 that defendants shall respond to plaintiffs motion to increase the number of depositions that plaintiffs may take 102 by July 13, 2012. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
September 27, 2013 146 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/27/13 denying 136 Motion to Compel. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
October 8, 2013 151 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/8/13 denying 140 Motion to Compel. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
April 29, 2014 195 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/29/14 denying as moot 63 Motion to Certify Class; denying as moot 167 Motion for Judgment. Finally ordering the Clerk of Court to enter final judgment consistent with this opinion. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
August 13, 2014 212 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/13/14 denying 201 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (cc: all counsel) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Frank et al v. Walker et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne B Judd
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Boardman
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Reincke
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Jo Howard
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra M Brisco
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney L Hall
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J Genin
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Louis Geoffroy
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A Nelson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gottlieb
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J Kennedy
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel E Robinson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walker
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Barland
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Nichol
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brennan
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cane
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G Deininger
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Vocke
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Kligman
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Meszaros
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Kvasnicka
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Lahti
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domonique Whitehurst
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hogan
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthelle Frank
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Ellis
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Luft
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dartric Davis
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Oden
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Jashinski
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sharp
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Dukes
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Judd
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Shea
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Dearing
Represented By: Nancy G Abudu
Represented By: Karen E Cunningham
Represented By: Laurence J Dupuis
Represented By: Heather Maria Johnson
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Represented By: M Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Karyn L Rotker
Represented By: Jonathan L Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]