Kovacs v. United States Department of Justice

Appellee: United States Department of Justice
Appellant: Nancy Ellen Kovacs
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01140
Filed: December 16, 2011
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/29/13 that appellant has until 8/12/2013 to file a supplemental brief in support of her request to add documents to the record on appeal. Further ordering that appellee has 10 days following the filing of appellants brief to file a response, if any. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
August 27, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/27/13 that appellants request to modify the record for appeal is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The clerk shall include in the record for appeal the record on appeal from the bankruptcy court (Docket #1)and all of the other documents filed in this court in connection with the present appeal (Docket #2 through #21). (cc: all counsel)(dm)
August 6, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/6/12 affirming the judgment of the bankruptcy court in awarding to plaintiff $3,750 in attorneys fees. (cc: all counsel)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kovacs v. United States Department of Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Hilarie E Snyder
Represented By: James C Strong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy Ellen Kovacs
Represented By: Olivia M Kelley
Represented By: Douglas H Frazer
Represented By: David V Meany
Represented By: Timothy M Van de Kamp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]