Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al v. Meller Anlagenbau GMBH

Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Defendant: Meller Anlagenbau GMBH
Involuntary_plaintiff: Fransisco Alcala
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01227
Filed: December 4, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 3/28/2013 DENYING 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge Rudolph T. Randa, the Court will initiate the call. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 29, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 8/29/2013 GRANTING 27 Meller's Motion to Compel Production of Witness Statements and Incident Report; and GRANTING 32 Meller's Motion to Supplement the Record on its Motion to Comp el Production of Witness Statements and Incident Report. If the plaintiff wants the Court to conduct an in camera review of the documents at issue in ECF No. 27, it should submit those documents under seal within 10 days of the date of this Order. The Scheduling Order, ECF No. 24, is amended as follows: the deadline for Fact Discovery is 2/28/2014; the deadline for Expert Discovery is 6/13/2014. (cc: all counsel) (Zik, Linda)
September 17, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/17/2013 GRANTING 27 MOTION to Compel Statements and Incident Report. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 15, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/15/2014 DENYING 42 Motion to Compel. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
June 18, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/18/2014. Plaintiff's MOTIONS to Quash 47 52 56 DENIED; Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline 51 DENIED; Defendant's MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served upon Henning Co nstruction 55 DENIED as Moot; Defendant's MOTON for Enlargement and to Extend Case Management Dates 62 GRANTED; S&R Egg Farm must comply with subpoenas and permit inspection of barn within 30 days of the date of this Order; Deadline for Defe ndant's expert disclosures is 30 days after date of inspection; Deadline for all expert discovery is 60 days after date of inspection; Dispositive motions due 90 days after date of inspection; Final pre-trial conference and jury trial are ADJOURNED subject to re-scheduling after the Court issues a ruling on dispositive motions. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al v. Meller Anlagenbau GMBH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip C Theesfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meller Anlagenbau GMBH
Represented By: Arnd N von Waldow
Represented By: Leonard E Hudson
Represented By: Michael L DeMarino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Involuntary_plaintiff: Fransisco Alcala
Represented By: James A Carney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]