Yang v. Luy et al

Defendant: Enrique Luy and Patricia Billings
Plaintiff: Lee Poua Yang
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00013
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/18/2013. Yang to make arrangements to provide medical records to Atty. DeKosky by 12/12/2013. Prior to that date, Yang to send letter to Court, copying opposing counsel, indicating date by which records wi ll be provided or why they cannot be provided. Deadlines set by 17 Scheduling Order terminated. 18 MOTION for appointment of counsel and 20 23 25 MOTIONS for Extension of Time DISMISSED as moot. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lee Yang at Milwaukee County House of Correction)(cb)
August 5, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/5/2014 DENYING without prejudice 18 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2014 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) before Judge Rudolph T. Randa, the Court will initiate the call. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A) (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lee Poua Yang)(cb)
September 30, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/30/2014. Action DISMISSED for lack of prosecution. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lee Poua Yang)(cb)
January 18, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 1/18/2013 GRANTING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING without prejudice 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lee Poua Yang)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yang v. Luy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Luy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Billings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Poua Yang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]