Day v. Pollard

Plaintiff: David A Day
Defendant: William Pollard
Case Number: 2:2013cv00106
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 5/21/2013 GRANTING 6 Motion to Dismiss. Action DISMISSED as untimely. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to David Day at Waupun Correctional Institution) (cb)
February 27, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 2/27/2014 DENYING 24 Motion for Relief/Motion to Appoint Counsel. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to David Day at Waupun Correctional Institution) (cb)
March 7, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 3/7/2013 re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David A. Day. Respondent must file answer, motion, or other responsive pleading on or before 4/19/2013. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Gregory Weber - with copy of petition)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. Pollard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Day
Represented By: Gerald P Boyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]