Crain v. Schwochert

Petitioner: Richard R Crain
Respondent: Jim Schwochert
Case Number: 2:2013cv00296
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/1/13 denying as moot 11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Further ordering that petitioner has until 9/3/2013 to file his reply to respondents answer and brief in opposition to the petition. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner) (dm)
March 7, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/7/14 that respondent shall provide the court with a status update in this case by 3/17/2014, which indicates whether petitioner has in fact passed away. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner)(dm)
March 31, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/31/14 that the case is DISMISSED AS MOOT. (cc: all counsel)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crain v. Schwochert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard R Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Schwochert
Represented By: Katherine Desmond Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.