Speare Tools Inc v. Klein Tools Inc

Defendant: Klein Tools Inc
Plaintiff: Speare Tools Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv00324
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Walworth
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/18/2014 GRANTING 67 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment. 78 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony DENIED as moot. 87 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File < i>Sur-Reply GRANTED. 77 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Document DENIED. 72 Defendant's MOTION to Seal Document DENIED. 97 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document GRANTED. 93 Defendant's MOTION for Attorney Fees GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART, Klein Tools awarded $7,718.95 in attorney's fees. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
March 7, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 3/7/2014. 37 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File an Expedited Motion in Excess of Three Pages DENIED. Clerk of Court DIRECTED TO FILE [37-1] Proposed Motion. It must be treated and briefed in accordance with Civil L.R. 7(a)-(f). 45 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Reply Brief GRANTED. Clerk of Court DIRECTED TO STRIKE 44 Reply Brief in Support. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
July 15, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/15/2014. 39 Klein's MOTION to compel DENIED AS MOOT; 41 Klein's MOTION for extension of time DENIED AS MOOT; 47 Speare's MOTION to Compel DENIED; 55 Klein's MOTION to Strike Section III of Speare's Reply Brief DENIED; 55 Klein's MOTION to file sur-reply GRANTED; 57 60 Klein's MOTIONS to strike and bar DENIED; 61 Klein's MOTION to seal GRANTED. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speare Tools Inc v. Klein Tools Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klein Tools Inc
Represented By: Bradley J Hulbert
Represented By: James L Lovsin
Represented By: Eric R Moran
Represented By: Brian A Price
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speare Tools Inc
Represented By: Lee F Grossman
Represented By: Tina P Fowler
Represented By: Tejal P Fowler
Represented By: Mark M Grossman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]