Madden v. Luy et al

Defendant: UW Madison Hospital, Enrique Luy and Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Robert Madden
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00549
Filed: May 15, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Racine
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/1/2013. 6/21/2013 Order and Judgment dismissing this case are VACATED; case to be REOPENED. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 GRANTED. Plaintiff to file amended complaint by 7/22/2013; failure to file may result in dismissal of action. Wis. Dept. of Corrections to collect $332.37 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's prison trust account in accordance with 28 USC § 1915(b)(2). (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Robert Madden; Warden-Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
August 27, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/27/2013. Wisconsin Department of Corrections, David Foley and UW Madison Hospital DISMISSED from this action. 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Robert Madden DENIED. Defendant to file responsive plead ing within 60 days of receiving electronic notice of this Order. Wis. Dept. of Corrections to collect $332.37 balance of filing fee in monthly installments from plaintiff's prison trust account. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Robert Madden and Warden at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
December 4, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 12/4/2013. 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff may proceed on second amended complaint against Defendants Dr. David Foley and Dr. Enrique Luy; he may not proce ed against UW Madison Hospital and Wisconsin Dept. of Corrections. US Marshal to serve Defendant Foley with second amended complaint. Defendants to file answer to second amended complaint. 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel DENIED. 21 MOTION to Intervene DENIED. 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order DENIED. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Robert Madden at New Lisbon Correctional Institution)(cb)
April 2, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 4/2/2014. 36 43 MOTIONS to Appoint Counsel DENIED; 38 MOTION to Intervene DENIED; 42 44 MOTIONS for Production of Medical Documents DENIED. 40 MOTION for Continuance of Scheduling Order GRANTED: Discovery now due 6/2/2014, Dispositive Motions now due 7/3/2014. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Robert Madden at New Lisbon Correctional Institution)(cb)
June 21, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/21/2013. Action DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Motions terminated: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Robert Madden at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Madden v. Luy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UW Madison Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Luy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Madden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]