Barnes v. Brown County et al

Defendant: Detective Dernbach, Guy Shepardson, John Laux, Mark Hackett, Zak Hoschbach, Jeff Lade, Dave Poteat, Brown County Drug Task Force, Brown County, John and Jane Does, Sealed Defendant #1 and Sealed Defendant #2
Plaintiff: Lamon Lamar Barnes
Case Number: 2:2013cv00607
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/18/2013. 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis GRANTED. 10 MOTION to reverse Court's Order to seal GRANTED; Court's Order sealing portions of complaint, amended complaint and exhibi ts 9 VACATED, filings to be unsealed and made part of public record. 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint GRANTED; plaintiff to file second amended pleading by 12/13/2013. Wisconsin Dept. of Corrections to collect $284.31 balance of filing fee from plaintiff's prison trust account, (cc: via US mail to Warden and Lamon Barnes at Waupun Correctional Institution, Corey Finkelmeyer at Wis. Dept. of Justice)(cb)
April 25, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 4/25/2014. 19 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint DENIED as moot; 23 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction DENIED; 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel DENIED; 29 MOTION to C ertify Class DENIED; 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint GRANTED. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to file Proposed Amended Complaint [34-1] as operative complaint in this action. US Marshal to serve copy of amended Complaint and this Order upon defendants pursuant to FRCP 4. Defendants to file responsive pleading to amended Complaint. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Lamon Barnes at Waupun Correctional Institution)(cb)
August 7, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/7/2014. 37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration/to Clarify DENIED; 60 Plaintiff's MOTION for Express Ruling Concerning Discovery DENIED; 63 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment/Con tempt DENIED; 80 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Use Release Account for Remainder of Filing Fee GRANTED, Warden to forward $38.79 to Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this Order. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Warden and Lamon Barnes at Fox Lake Correctional Institution)(cb)
June 18, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/18/2013. Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits to be SEALED. Redacted versions of those documents to be filed in the public record. See Order for details. (cc: via US mail to Lamon Lamar Barnes at Oshkosh Correctional Institution)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Brown County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Dernbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Shepardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Laux
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hackett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zak Hoschbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Poteat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown County Drug Task Force
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Defendant #1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Defendant #2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamon Lamar Barnes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]