Jordan v. Oddsen et al

Plaintiff: Joe'vone M Jordan
Defendant: Joshua O Oddsen, Joseph Beahm, Thomas Nelson, Robert J Rymarkiewicz, Brian Greff, James A Nyhus, Anthony Meli, Andrew Moungey, Jason J Grahl, Eric J Billington, Joseph J Keys, Jason Wenzel, CO Staniec, Mitchell L Bille and CO Burns
Case Number: 2:2013cv00640
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Fond du Lac
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 11/13/13 GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that Off icers Joshua Oddsen and Staniec are DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file a responsive pleading within 60 days. FURTHER ORDERED that the DOC shall collect the balance of the filing fee in accordance with 28 USC § 1915(b)(2). See order for additional details. (cc: all counsel, mailed via USPS to plaintiff and warden) (djd)
July 22, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 7/22/2014 re Plaintiff's motions - DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel; DENYING 28 Motion to Supplement; DENYING 31 Motion to Stay; DENYING 32 Motion f or Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint; DENYING 33 Motion to Amend Complaint; GRANTING 17 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING 18 Motion for Protective Order; WITHDRAWN 19 Motion for Leave to File a motion to ame nd the complaint and 20 Motion to Amend Complaint; DENYING 24 Motion for Leave to File motion to amend complaint. FURTHER ORDERED defts shall not purge defts' personnel files or destroy any documents or other evidence that may relate to the plaintiff's claims until this case is completed. (cc: all counsel, mailed to plaintiff) (djd)
March 25, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 3/25/2015 DENYING 36 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; DENYING 41 Motion for Order Allowing Plaintiff Access to His Release Account for Litigation Costs; DENYING 49 Motion to Compel Discovery; DENYING 50 Motion to Compel Discovery; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel; DENYING AS MOOT 56 Motion for Reconsideration; GRANTING 64 Motion for Leave to File; and denying 82 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Findings of Fact. (cc: all counsel) (teb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Oddsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe'vone M Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua O Oddsen
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Beahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Rymarkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Greff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Nyhus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Meli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Moungey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason J Grahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J Keys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Staniec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell L Bille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.