Picotte v. Foster

Petitioner: Waylon J Picotte, Sr
Respondent: Brian Foster
Case Number: 2:2013cv00853
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Sheboygan
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/16/14 that unless petitioner files a response to respondents motion to dismiss within thirty days of the date of this order, I will assume that the motion is unopposed and will grant it. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner)(dm)
June 16, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/16/14 granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment. Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Rules Governing § 2254 Cases, I find that the petitioner has not made the showing required by 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2), and therefore I will not issue a certificate of appealability. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner) (dm)
August 29, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/29/13 that this case will be dismissed for failure to pay the filing fee if petitioner does not either pay the fee or request leave to proceed without prepayment of the fee within twenty-one days of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner)(dm)
September 9, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/9/13 that within thirty (30) days of the date of this order respondent ANSWER the petition, showing cause, if any, why the writ should not issue. Further ordering that unless respondent files a dispositive motion with its answer the parties shall abide by the briefing schedule set forth herein. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to petitioner)(dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picotte v. Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Waylon J Picotte, Sr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Foster
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]