UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Richard J. Harris, Cheryl J. Skenandore and Consumers Coop
Case Number: 3:2009cv00010
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Vernon
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/11/09. (rep)
August 17, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff United States of America dismissing the case. (BBC / PAO). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B) (krj)
November 4, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER confirming sale. Copy of order mailed to T.Whisler and C.Skenandore. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/4/2009. (llj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Harris et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Megan McDermott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl J. Skenandore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Coop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]