Bronk, Leonard v. Cirilli, John

Appellant: Leonard D. Bronk
Appellee: John M. Cirilli
Case Number: 3:2011cv00172
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Portage
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the December 7, 2012 appeal. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/11/2013. (lak)
January 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing the December 7th, 2012 appeal and closing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/11/2013. (lak)
January 24, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing transfer of bankruptcy court record in case 13-cv-53 to case 11-cv-172. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal Filed in Case 13-cv-53, # 2 Appeal Information Sheet Filed in Case 13-cv-53, # 3 Transmittal of Record on Appeal Filed in Case 13-cv-53, # 4 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet for Case 1-09-15224, # 5 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet for Case 1-10-00044) (lak)
October 18, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (WMC / PAO). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/18/2012. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronk, Leonard v. Cirilli, John
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leonard D. Bronk
Represented By: Jared Redfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John M. Cirilli
Represented By: John M. Cirilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]