Laborers Local 236, AFL-CIO et al v. Walker, Scott et al

Plaintiff: Laborers Local 236, AFL-CIO, AFSCME Local 60, AFL-CIO and Jamie O'Brien
Defendant: Scott Walker, James R. Scott, Judith Neumann and Rodney G. Pasch
Case Number: 3:2011cv00462
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 39 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Plaintiffs AFSCME Local 60, AFL-CIO, Laborers Local 236, AFL-CIO and Jamie O'Brien. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/8/2012. (voc)
September 11, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants; Granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by defendant City of Madison; Granting 27 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Granting 43 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Intervenor Defendants; Denying as moot 46 Motion for Reconsideration by plaintiffs; Denying as moot 60 Motion for Status Conference by plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/11/2013. (voc)
September 13, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Judith Neumann, Rodney G. Pasch, James R. Scott and Scott Walker dismissing the case. ( PAO). Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 9/13/2013. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborers Local 236, AFL-CIO et al v. Walker, Scott et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Local 236, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Kathleen Meter Lounsbury
Represented By: Bruce F. Ehlke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFSCME Local 60, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Kathleen Meter Lounsbury
Represented By: Bruce F. Ehlke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie O'Brien
Represented By: Kathleen Meter Lounsbury
Represented By: Bruce F. Ehlke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walker
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Scott
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Neumann
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney G. Pasch
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]