Eichline, Earl et al v. Kepler, Michael

Appellant: Earl Arthur Eichline and Earl A. Eichline Revocable Trust
Appellee: Michael E. Kepler
Case Number: 3:2012cv00113
Filed: February 14, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Appellee Michael E. Kepler dismissing the case. (VO). Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 9/30/2014. (voc)
August 16, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER remanding action to Bankruptcy Court for further proceedings RE: 1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/16/2013. (voc) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/16/2013) (voc).
August 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT remanding case to bankruptcy court. (WMC / PAO). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/20/2013. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eichline, Earl et al v. Kepler, Michael
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Earl Arthur Eichline
Represented By: Robert Taylor Kasdorf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Earl A. Eichline Revocable Trust
Represented By: Robert Taylor Kasdorf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael E. Kepler
Represented By: Michael E. Kepler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]