Novus Franchising, Inc. v. Superior Entrance Systems, Inc. et al

Counter_claimant: Knute R. Pedersen, Superior Entrance Systems, Inc. and Superior Glass, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Novus Franchising, Inc.
Plaintiff: Novus Franchising, Inc.
Defendant: Superior Entrance Systems, Inc., Superior Glass, Inc. and Knute R. Pedersen
Case Number: 3:2012cv00204
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot defendants' two motions in limine; finding no material breach of the Franchise Agreement on the part of plaintiff; awarding damages for royalties; and providing other declaratory relief. Deadlines set for filing and briefing of attorney fees. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/27/2012. (llj)
January 3, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered granting summary judgment in part in favor of plaintiff and in part in favor of defendant; granting injunctive relief in favor of plaintiff; awarding $12,600 to plaintiff in damages. (WMC/llj) Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/3/2013. (llj)
February 26, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT awarding plaintiff Novus Franchising, Inc. attorney fees in the amount of $118,748.26 and costs in the amount of $5,997.14. (PAO) (arw)
May 16, 2013 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's request for finding of contempt. Defendant Superior Glass to pay plaintiff $1,000 for violations of court's injunction; defendants to remove any reference linking Superior Glass, Inc. to windshield repair or rock-chip repair services. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/16/13. (krj)
November 20, 2013 180 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Order Following Settlement. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/20/2013. (voc)
May 22, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave to File surreply. Motion for stay of proceedings 31 to be decided after 5/24/12 injunction hearing. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/21/2012. (voc)
August 16, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' request for trial by jury. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/15/12. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novus Franchising, Inc. v. Superior Entrance Systems, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Knute R. Pedersen
Represented By: Kyle Hoff Torvinen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Superior Entrance Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Hoff Torvinen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Superior Glass, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Hoff Torvinen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Novus Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: James Michel Susag
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Tegt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novus Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Tegt
Represented By: James Michel Susag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Entrance Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Hoff Torvinen
Represented By: Lukas J. Saunders
Represented By: Mitchell Adam Routh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Glass, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Hoff Torvinen
Represented By: Lukas J. Saunders
Represented By: Mitchell Adam Routh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knute R. Pedersen
Represented By: Mitchell Adam Routh
Represented By: Lukas J. Saunders
Represented By: Kyle Hoff Torvinen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]