Hackel, Jon v. National Feeds, Inc. et al

Third_party_plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and National Feeds, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jon Hackel
Defendant: National Feeds, Inc. and Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Third_party_defendant: United Pet Foods, Inc. and Cincinnati Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00642
Filed: August 31, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants National Feeds, Inc. Denying 89 Motion for Leave to File Motion For Summary Judgment With Respect to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/9/2013. (voc)
December 13, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 156 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff Jon Hackel is required to supplement his response to United's second set of discovery request before 12/19/2013. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/13/2013. (voc)
January 3, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/3/2014. (voc)
January 7, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 201 Motion in Limine Regarding Plaintiff's Presentation of Expert Opinions on Damage by Defendants National Feeds, Inc., Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/7/2014. (voc)
January 10, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 212 Memorandum in Support of Proposed Jury Instructions and Special Verdict filed by National Feeds, Inc., Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. It is ordered that defendant's challenges to plaintiff's misrepresentation claims are rejected. The court will provide instructions to the jury on these claims and the special verdict form will ask the jury to assess liability as to these two claims. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/10/14. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hackel, Jon v. National Feeds, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William James Katt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: National Feeds, Inc.
Represented By: William James Katt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Hackel
Represented By: Michael J. Brose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Feeds, Inc.
Represented By: William James Katt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William James Katt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: United Pet Foods, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]