McNamee, Cheryl v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Cheryl A. McNamee
Case Number: 3:2013cv00010
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered denying 2255 motion. ( PAO). (rep)
May 24, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed IFP. Affidavit of Indigency due 7/1/2013. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/23/2013. (arw)
July 2, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing petitioner Cheryl McNamee's 5/15/13 letter (dkt. 11 -2) as a request for extension of time and granting the extension. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/1/13. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamee, Cheryl v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy Michael O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cheryl A. McNamee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.