Carrasco-Salazar, Roberto v. U.S. BOP Medical Staff et al

Plaintiff: Roberto Carrasco-Salazar
Defendant: U.S. BOP Medical Staff, Faerday, Reed, Spahn, Lopez, Gupta and Ritter
Case Number: 3:2013cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant Ritter's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/14/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 4, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to submit six-month trust fund account statement by 1/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/4/2013. (elc),(ps)
January 11, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 8.82 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 4, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 32 motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants Gregg Fearday, Judith Spahn, Cesar Lopez and Ravi Gupta, M.D. is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED. The clerk of court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/04/2015. (nln),(ps)
February 4, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrasco-Salazar, Roberto v. U.S. BOP Medical Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Carrasco-Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BOP Medical Staff
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faerday
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spahn
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gupta
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritter
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]