Stewart, David v. Pugh, Jeffery

Petitioner: David C. Stewart
Respondent: Jeffery Pugh
Case Number: 3:2013cv00014
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Chippewa
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp denied. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/24/2015. (jef),(ps)
January 8, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit Trust fund account statement and a petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or the $5 filing fee. Trust Fund Account Statement and petition or $5 filing fee due 1/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/8/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 28, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/28/2014. (jef),(ps)
February 28, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing the 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David C. Stewart. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
March 19, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 7 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Docket Sheet) (elc),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart, David v. Pugh, Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David C. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffery Pugh
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.