Giese, Richard v. Tegels, Lizzie

Petitioner: Richard L. Giese
Respondent: Lizzie Tegels
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00062
Filed: January 25, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Juneau
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petitioner's motion for post conviction relief under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for petitioner's failure to show that he did not receive a full andfair opportunity to litigate his Fourth Amendment claims in state court. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/20/2013. (elc),(ps)
August 20, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered denying petitioner Richard Giese's motion for post conviction relief under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for his failure to show that he did not receive a full and fair opportunity to litigate his Fourth Amendment claims in state court. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
November 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 20 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Information sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Order, # 4 Judgment, # 5 Order, 10/23/13, # 6 Docket sheet) (jef),(ps)
December 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 22 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/6/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Giese, Richard v. Tegels, Lizzie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard L. Giese
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lizzie Tegels
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]